AZ SB1152 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Homeless court; establishment; jurisdiction.
Title
Homeless court; establishment; jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Driggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor Signed | |
2012-04-02 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-29 | House third reading PASSED voting: (49-7-4-0) | |
2012-03-28 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2012-03-27 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-27 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-26 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-15 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-22 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2012-02-22 | House read second time | |
2012-02-21 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-21 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-16 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-16 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-07 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-07 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-06 | Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2012-01-19 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |