AZ SB1148 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Introduced in House and read first time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Introduced in House and read first time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicle sale price; VLT
Title
Vehicle sale price; VLT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-03-15 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0) |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 5801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 5804 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 5805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 5806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |