AZ SB1141 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Legal tender; taxation; regulation
Title
Legal tender; taxation; regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Financial Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Financial Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Governor Vetoed | |
2016-05-04 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (18-10-2-0) |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-25 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-04-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (33-24-3-0) |
2016-04-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2016-04-07 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-07 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | House FSR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-3-0) |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to House FSR Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | Assigned to House FSR Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-11-1-0) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate FI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate FI Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FI Committee |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |