AZ SB1137 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (17-13-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (17-13-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Medical marijuana; prohibited chemicals; appropriation
Title
Medical marijuana; prohibited chemicals; appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (17-13-0-0) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-1-0) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate WAG Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate WAG Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Agriculture - Title 3
Allowable Pesticide Products
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations
Compliance
Designated Caregiver
Inspections
Marijuana
Medical Marijuana
Medical Marijuana Fund
Nonprofit Medical Marijuana Dispensary
Prohibited Chemicals
Rfeir
Allowable Pesticide Products
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations
Compliance
Designated Caregiver
Inspections
Marijuana
Medical Marijuana
Medical Marijuana Fund
Nonprofit Medical Marijuana Dispensary
Prohibited Chemicals
Rfeir
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 109.03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 364 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |