AZ SB1131 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Introduced in House and read first time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Introduced in House and read first time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
First responder special plates
Title
First responder special plates
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Miranda [D] | Rep. Robert Meza [D] | Sen. Carlyle Begay [R] | Sen. Barbara McGuire [D] |
Sen. Don Shooter [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Rep. Noel Campbell [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-5-1-0) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-1-0) |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate TRANS Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANS Committee |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |