AZ SB1122 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
School consolidation elections; majority vote
Title
School consolidation elections; majority vote
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-16-1-0) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Common School Districts
Education - Title 15
Effective Date
Majority Vote
School Consolidation Election
School District
School District Consolidations
School Elections
Education - Title 15
Effective Date
Majority Vote
School Consolidation Election
School District
School District Consolidations
School Elections