AZ SB1119 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Attorney general; federal executive orders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Attorney general; federal executive orders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-28 Governor Vetoed
2021-05-28 Transmitted to Governor
2021-05-26SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-05-26HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0)
2021-05-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-03-31HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-31HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-29HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-03-29HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-24HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-09HouseHouse read second time
2021-03-08HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-03-08HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2021-03-08HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-03-04HouseTransmit to House
2021-03-03SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2021-03-02SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-03-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2021-02-24SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-24SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-24SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-23SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0)
2021-01-13SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-12SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-12SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
43432Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74532
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1119p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1119s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.1119gowan.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1119approp.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484974
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486385
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487716
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488122
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489818
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489887
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489922
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489971
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74532&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74532&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74532&billStatusActionId=201979&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74532&billStatusActionId=202329&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74532&billStatusActionId=202531&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74532&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74532&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74532&billStatusActionId=204249&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74532&billStatusActionId=204255&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback