AZ SB1115 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Chapter 266
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Chapter 266
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
PSPRS; retirement benefit calculation
Title
PSPRS; retirement benefit calculation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chapter 266 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-0-4-0) |
2017-03-28 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-28 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-27 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-03-20 | House | House BI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-3-0-0) |
2017-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2017-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Assigned to House BI Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-03-06 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 842 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 845 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |