AZ SB1114 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-06 - Referred to House JUD Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-06 - Referred to House JUD Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Ignition interlock device; exception
Title
Ignition interlock device; exception
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2012-03-06 | House read second time | |
2012-03-05 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-02 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-02 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-3-1-0) | |
2012-02-01 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-01-31 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-31 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-30 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |