AZ SB1109 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Chapter 350
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Chapter 350
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Arizona health facilities authority; continuation
Title
Arizona health facilities authority; continuation
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Chapter 350 | |
2016-05-19 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-05 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-05-05 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-3-4-0) |
2016-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-15 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-1-0) |
2016-02-22 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2016-02-22 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |