AZ SB1105 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Consumer fraud; technical correction
Title
Consumer fraud; technical correction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-02 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2010-01-14 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |