AZ SB1099 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-27 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-27 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Electronic records; state library
Title
Electronic records; state library
Sponsors
Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. Adam Driggs [R] | Sen. Barbara McGuire [D] |
Sen. Anna Tovar [D] | Sen. Bob Worsley [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0) |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2013-03-21 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-0-0) |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to House TI Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2013-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-3-0) |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate GE Committee |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |