AZ SB1091 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Chapter 239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Chapter 239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Controlled substances monitoring program; delegates
Title
Controlled substances monitoring program; delegates
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Pace [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 239 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-04-08 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-6-2-0) |
2021-03-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-15 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-25 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-11 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Controlled Substances
Controlled Substances Prescription Monitoring Program
Delegates
Department Of Health Services
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Controlled Substances Prescription Monitoring Program
Delegates
Department Of Health Services
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 2604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2610 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |