AZ SB1091 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
CPS workers; investigations; group homes
Title
CPS workers; investigations; group homes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-19 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-04-19 | House third reading , voting: (55-0-5-0) | |
2010-04-15 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-04-15 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-15 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-15 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-17 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2010-03-09 | House read second time | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-01-28 | Transmit to House | |
2010-01-28 | Senate third reading , voting: (26-1-2-0) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate Consent Calendar January 25, 2010 @ 1:38 PM | |
2010-01-26 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-01-26 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-01-25 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2010-01-14 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |