AZ SB1089 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-5-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-5-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public records requests; contact information
Title
Public records requests; contact information
Sponsors
Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-5-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-12-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Contact Information
Public Records
Public Records Requests
Public Records, Printing And Notices - Title 39
Public Records
Public Records Requests
Public Records, Printing And Notices - Title 39