AZ SB1086 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-23 - Senate Consent Calendar January 23, 2012 @ 2:10 PM with Objections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-23 - Senate Consent Calendar January 23, 2012 @ 2:10 PM with Objections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
AHCCCS; ALTCS; reimbursement rates
Title
AHCCCS; ALTCS; reimbursement rates
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-23 | Senate Consent Calendar January 23, 2012 @ 2:10 PM with Objections | |
2012-01-24 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-24 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-23 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-11 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Senate HMLR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2012-01-12 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-11 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-11 | Assigned to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |