AZ SB1084 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Senate ED Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Average daily membership; homeschool students

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Average daily membership; homeschool students

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21SenateSenate ED Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-01-14SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2020-01-13SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-01-08SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15901Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback