AZ SB1084 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Condominium; termination; appraisal dispute
Title
Condominium; termination; appraisal dispute
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-04-03 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-04-02 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-03-21 | House | House LIA Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-2-0-1-0-0) |
2018-02-20 | House | House read second time |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned to House LIA Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-02-15 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |