AZ SB1079 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Chapter 142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Chapter 142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Solid waste collection; multifamily housing
Title
Solid waste collection; multifamily housing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Chapter 142 | |
2015-04-01 | Governor Signed | |
2015-03-26 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (21-8-1-0) |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-24 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-23-3-0) |
2015-03-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-03-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-09 | House | House EENR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-0-0-0) |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to House EENR Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | House read second time |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to House EENR Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-5-1-0) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |