AZ SB1047 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tax credit; school tuition organizations
Title
Tax credit; school tuition organizations
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Biggs [R] | Sen. Debbie Lesko [R] | Sen. Rick Murphy [R] | Sen. Steven Yarbrough [R] |
Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 8 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 8 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Governor Signed | |
2012-02-23 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-02-23 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-23 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-13 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-02 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-06 | House WM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-06 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2012-02-06 | House read second time | |
2012-02-02 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-01-19 | Transmit to House | |
2012-01-19 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-9-1-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-01-17 | Senate Consent Calendar January 17, 2012 @ 2:02 PM with Objections | |
2012-01-17 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-17 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-17 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-09 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-12 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0) | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-01-10 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-09 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-09 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-01-09 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |