AZ SB1044 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Chapter 357
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Chapter 357
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Credit for reinsurance
Title
Credit for reinsurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Senate | Chapter 357 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-05-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2021-03-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-15 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-02 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-25 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-01-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Asset
Credit
Credit For Reinsurance
Declaration
Definition
Definitions
Domestic Ceding Insurer
Insurance - Title 20
Intent
Purpose
Reduction From Liability
Reinsurance
Rules
United States Financial Institution
Credit
Credit For Reinsurance
Declaration
Definition
Definitions
Domestic Ceding Insurer
Insurance - Title 20
Intent
Purpose
Reduction From Liability
Reinsurance
Rules
United States Financial Institution
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1068 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1094.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1098.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1098.11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1557 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 261.01 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 261.02 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 261.03 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 261.04 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 261.05 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 261.06 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 261.07 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 261.08 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |