AZ SB1040 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Chapter 143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Maternal morbidity; mortality; report

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maternal morbidity; mortality; report

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateChapter 143
2019-04-29SenateGovernor Signed
2019-04-23SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-23SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-04-23SenateSenate concurs
2019-04-23SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2019-04-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2019-04-17SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-04-17HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-04-17HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-09HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-09HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-08HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-21HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-27HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-11HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-11SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-02-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-05SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-05SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-04SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-01-30SenateSenate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2019-01-15SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-14SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-14SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-01-11SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
363501Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71099
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1040p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1040s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1040h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0143.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.1040brophy mcgee2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.10400146.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1040hhs.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1040brophy mcgee0849.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.1040barto.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.1040health human services.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71099&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71099&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71099&billStatusActionId=185988&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71099&billStatusActionId=186132&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71099&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71099&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71099&billStatusActionId=189007&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71099&billStatusActionId=189009&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71099&billStatusActionId=189090&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71099&billStatusActionId=189096&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback