AZ SB1033 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-2-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

ASRS; self-insurance program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ASRS; self-insurance program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-2-0-0)
2020-03-03HouseHouse read second time
2020-03-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-03-02HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2020-03-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-01-30HouseTransmit to House
2020-01-30SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0)
2020-01-28SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-01-28SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-01-27SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-01-27SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-01-22SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0)
2020-01-14SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2020-01-13SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-12-18SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38782Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38783Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback