AZ SB1025 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Transmit to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Elections; polls; override notification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; polls; override notification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseTransmit to House
2021-02-24SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2021-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-02SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-01SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-02-01SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-01-21SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0)
2021-01-12SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2021-01-11SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-01-04SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16580Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74321
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1025p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1025s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1025townsend0405.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/480750
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485325
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74321&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74321&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74321&billStatusActionId=201138&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74321&billStatusActionId=201701&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback