AZ SB1023 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Chapter 185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Chapter 185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Residential picketing; offense
Title
Residential picketing; offense
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | Chapter 185 |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-06-13 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (43-14-3-0) |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (25-3-2-0) |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate Conference adopted |
2023-06-13 | House | House Conference adopted |
2023-06-13 | House | House Conference caucus date |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate Conference caucus date |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Senate Conference report: That the Senate accept the House amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended. |
2023-06-12 | House | House Conference members: NGUYEN, KOLODIN, ORTIZ |
2023-06-12 | House | House Conference appointed |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Senate Conference members: KAVANAGH, KERN, MARSH |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Senate Conference appointed |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-05-09 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (42-10-7-0) |
2023-04-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-03-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2023-03-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2023-03-08 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2023-02-28 | House | House read second time |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-02-21 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-5-1-0) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Prefile |