AZ SB1005 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Senate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Technical correction; state highways

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Technical correction; state highways

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-15SenateSenate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-0)
2017-02-09SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2017-01-10SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-09SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-09SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-09SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2016-12-07SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
287046Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback