AZ SB1001 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House GOV Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-7-1-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Payment coupon books; homeowners' associations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Payment coupon books; homeowners' associations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-21 - House - House Government Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-7-1-0-0-0)
2020-03-11HouseHouse read second time
2020-03-10HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-03-10HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2020-03-10HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-03-09HouseTransmit to House
2020-03-09SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2020-03-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-03-03SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-03-03SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-03-02SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-02-17SenateSenate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-1-1-0)
2020-01-14SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2020-01-13SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-11-15SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
331256Amended CodeSee Bill Text
331807Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72479
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1001p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1001s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/s.10010921.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/s.10010134.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/s.1001farnsworth d.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1001gov.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1001floorfarnsworth d.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72479&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72479&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72479&billStatusActionId=195373&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72479&billStatusActionId=195483&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72479&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback