AZ HR2004 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Border wall; construction materials; repurpose
Title
Border wall; construction materials; repurpose
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Transmitted to Secretary of State | |
2022-02-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2022-02-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-02-01 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-01 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-31 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-01-31 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-24 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-7-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-19 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |