AZ HCR2057 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Phase-out business personal property tax
Title
Phase-out business personal property tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Senate ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (3-2-2-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Referred to Senate ED Committee | |
2010-04-01 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-03-30 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-29 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-01 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | |
2010-03-29 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-26 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-25 | House third reading , voting: (34-21-5-0) | |
2010-03-04 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2010-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-22 | House WM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-16 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2010-02-16 | House read second time | |
2010-02-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-15 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2010-02-15 | Introduced in House and read first time |