AZ HCR2039 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Access to postsecondary education day
Title
Access to postsecondary education day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2019-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0) |
2019-02-18 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-14 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |