AZ HCR2026 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Navajo code talkers
Title
Navajo code talkers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Transmitted to Secretary Of State | |
2010-04-01 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-01 | Senate third reading , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to Senate Committee | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to Senate Committee | |
2010-04-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-31 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-31 | House RULES Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-31 | House MAPS Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2010-01-26 | House read second time | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Introduced in House and read first time |