AZ HCR2019 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Support; water management policies
Title
Support; water management policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Transmitted to Secretary of State | |
2019-05-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-10-4-0) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate WAG Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate WAG Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (32-27-1-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0) |
2019-02-19 | House | House NREW Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-2-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-06 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |