AZ HCR2006 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-07-31 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-07-31 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Sessions of legislature; repeal sessions
Title
Sessions of legislature; repeal sessions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-07-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-03-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0) |
2023-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-15 | House | House MOE Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-14 | House | House read second time |
2023-02-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-02-13 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |