AZ HB2862 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Chapter 299
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Schools; instructional time models

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; instructional time models

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28SenateChapter 299
2021-04-28SenateGovernor Signed
2021-04-22SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-04-22HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (52-8-0-0)
2021-04-22HouseHouse concurs
2021-04-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2021-04-20HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2021-04-13HouseTransmit to House
2021-04-13SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (24-6-0-0)
2021-04-12SenateSenate motion to reconsider third reading
2021-04-08SenateSenate third reading FAILED voting: (12-16-2-0)
2021-04-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-03-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-22SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-03-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-16SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-1-0)
2021-03-08SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-04SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-04SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-03-03SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-03-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (46-14-0-0)
2021-03-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-22HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-02-22HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-16HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-15HouseHouse read second time
2021-02-11HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-02-11HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2021-02-11HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
151021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15861Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
15901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15901.08New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/76063
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2862p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2862h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2862s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0299.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.2862udall.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.2862udall2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.2862boyer0748.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484155
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484819
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486418
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487009
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488528
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488888
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489125
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76063&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76063&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76063&billStatusActionId=202532&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76063&billStatusActionId=202546&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76063&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76063&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76063&billStatusActionId=203495&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76063&billStatusActionId=203628&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76063&billStatusActionId=203656&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76063&billStatusActionId=203686&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76063&billStatusActionId=203806&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76063&billStatusActionId=203820&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback