AZ HB2807 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Chapter 362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Chapter 362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sierra Vista; hummingbird capital
Title
Sierra Vista; hummingbird capital
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Chapter 362 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-05 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (55-4-1-0) |
2021-05-05 | House | House concurs |
2021-05-05 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2021-05-05 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2021-05-03 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-4-0-0) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0) |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-09 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Archaeology Advisory Commission
Hummingbird Capital (h)
Purpose
Sierra Vista (h)
State Emblems (h)
State Government - Title 41
Strike Everything Amendment (h)
Hummingbird Capital (h)
Purpose
Sierra Vista (h)
State Emblems (h)
State Government - Title 41
Strike Everything Amendment (h)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 3022.17 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 847 | New Code | See Bill Text |