AZ HB2789 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Corporation commission rules; legislative approval
Title
Corporation commission rules; legislative approval
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 16 N: 32 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 16 N: 32 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-03-06 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-14 | Senate GR Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-2-1-0) | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-06 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-06 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-03-06 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-03-06 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-05 | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0) | |
2012-03-02 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-01 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-29 | House RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0) | |
2012-02-07 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-14 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-08 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2012-02-08 | House read second time | |
2012-02-07 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced in House and read first time |