AZ HB2774 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
County transportation planning assistant.
Title
County transportation planning assistant.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Carroll [R] | Rep. Kevin Payne [R] | Rep. Beverly Pingerelli [R] | Rep. Ben Toma [R] |
Rep. Justin Wilmeth [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-12-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-08 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-04 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |