AZ HB2773 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Spirituous liquor; delivery; off-sale permits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Spirituous liquor; delivery; off-sale permits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-04-06SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-04-05SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-24SenateSenate COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-1-0)
2021-03-08SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-04SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-04SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-03-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (34-26-0-0)
2021-03-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-16HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-16HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-15HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-12SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-09HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-04HouseHouse read second time
2021-02-03HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-02-03HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2021-02-03HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4205.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4205.13New CodeSee Bill Text
4206.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4210.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4244Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75871
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2773p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2773h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.2773weninger.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/h.2773commerce.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.27730325.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.2773mesnard.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.2773com.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483306
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483921
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486816
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487752
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488580
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75871&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75871&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75871&billStatusActionId=202515&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75871&billStatusActionId=202522&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75871&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75871&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback