AZ HB2734 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public hearings; voting
Title
Public hearings; voting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Motion Representative Martinez motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), HB2734 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE ON RECON) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Motion Representative Martinez motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), HB2734 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE ON RECON) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate FICO Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (3-2-2-0) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FICO Committee |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (41-18-0-0) |
2024-02-22 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-22 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2024-02-13 | House | House Committee action: do pass amended/ strike everything on reconsideration, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-13 | House | House COM Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-5-1-0-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Assigned to House Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Affordable Housing
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Minimum Parking Requirements
Municipal Planning
Municipal Zoning
Parking Requirements
Prohibition
Public Hearings
Voting
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Minimum Parking Requirements
Municipal Planning
Municipal Zoning
Parking Requirements
Prohibition
Public Hearings
Voting