AZ HB2725 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

State documents; sex identification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State documents; sex identification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-16HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-15HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-02-15HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-10HouseHouse GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-03HouseHouse read second time
2021-02-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-02-02HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-02-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1503New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback