AZ HB2714 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter 200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter 200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental technology; biomass; forestry products
Title
Environmental technology; biomass; forestry products
Sponsors
Rep. Becky Nutt [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Senate | Chapter 200 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (55-3-2-0) |
2021-04-07 | House | House concurs |
2021-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2021-03-31 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2021-03-29 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-3-0) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (36-24-0-0) |
2021-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-01 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona Commerce Authority
Biomass
Environmental Technology (h)
Environmental Technology Facility
Forest Products
Forestry Products (h)
State Government - Title 41
Biomass
Environmental Technology (h)
Environmental Technology Facility
Forest Products
Forestry Products (h)
State Government - Title 41