AZ HB2699 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Chapter 84
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Chapter 84
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fire district bonds; merger; consolidation
Title
Fire district bonds; merger; consolidation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Chapter 84 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0) |
2022-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-16 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-08 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Bond Election (s)
Consolidation
Dissolution (s)
Fire District Bonds (s)
Fire Districts
Issuance (s)
Merger
Notice (s)
Procedures (s)
Sale (s)
Security (s)
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
Consolidation
Dissolution (s)
Fire District Bonds (s)
Fire Districts
Issuance (s)
Merger
Notice (s)
Procedures (s)
Sale (s)
Security (s)
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
48 | 806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 815.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |