AZ HB2699 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Driver license fees; homeless exemption
Title
Driver license fees; homeless exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-19 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-18 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 3002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |