AZ HB2694 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Chapter 275
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Chapter 275
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Theme park districts; formation; bonds
Title
Theme park districts; formation; bonds
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Tobin [R] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Chapter 275 | |
2014-04-30 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-6-2-0) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate CEM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Withdrawn |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate GE Committee action: Withdrawn |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate GE Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-07 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (44-14-2-0) |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-1-1-0) |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2014-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |