AZ HB2671 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Chapter 188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Animal cruelty; domestic animals; classification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal cruelty; domestic animals; classification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateChapter 188
2019-05-08SenateGovernor Signed
2019-05-06SenateDischarged from Commmittee
2019-05-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-05-02HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (42-18-0-0)
2019-05-02HouseDischarged from Commmittee
2019-05-02HouseHouse concurs
2019-04-24SenateSenate Conference members: UGENTI-RITA, MESNARD, STEELE
2019-04-24SenateSenate Conference appointed
2019-04-23HouseHouse Conference members: KAVANAGH, BARTO, ENGEL
2019-04-23HouseHouse Conference appointed
2019-04-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2019-04-23HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2019-04-11HouseTransmit to House
2019-04-11SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (20-9-1-0)
2019-04-11SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-02SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-01SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-28SenateSenate COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-1-0)
2019-03-25SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-21SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-21SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-03-05SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-03-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-25HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-1-0-0-0)
2019-02-19HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-18HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2019-02-18HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
381117New CodeSee Bill Text
411822Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72314
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2671p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2671h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2671s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0188.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.26710208.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2671com.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72314&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72314&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72314&billStatusActionId=187085&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72314&billStatusActionId=187668&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72314&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72314&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72314&billStatusActionId=188930&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72314&billStatusActionId=188938&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72314&billStatusActionId=189319&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72314&billStatusActionId=189320&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback