AZ HB2670 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Chapter 296
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Study committee; special education; gifted

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Study committee; special education; gifted

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07SenateChapter 296
2019-06-07SenateGovernor Signed
2019-05-24SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-05-24HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (59-0-1-0)
2019-05-24HouseHouse concurs
2019-05-21HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2019-05-21HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2019-05-16HouseTransmit to House
2019-05-16SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (25-1-4-0)
2019-04-23SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-02SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-01SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-26SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2019-03-05SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-04SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-04SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2019-03-04SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-03-01SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-02-28HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-25HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-21HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-21HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2019-02-21HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321023Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72313
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2670p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2670h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2670s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0296.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2670cobb.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.2670appropriations.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2670quezada808.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.2670carter0945.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72313&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72313&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72313&billStatusActionId=187258&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72313&billStatusActionId=187440&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72313&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72313&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72313&billStatusActionId=189082&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72313&billStatusActionId=189609&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72313&billStatusActionId=189759&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72313&billStatusActionId=189760&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback