AZ HB2658 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Community colleges; adult education
Title
Community colleges; adult education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-1-0) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (44-15-1-0) |
2022-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-02-08 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-2-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-07 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Ade (see Also: Department Of Education)
Adult Education Programs
Community Colleges
Department Of Education (ade)
Education - Title 15
Adult Education Programs
Community Colleges
Department Of Education (ade)
Education - Title 15