AZ HB2656 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - House third reading FAILED voting: (29-29-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - House third reading FAILED voting: (29-29-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Certain affiliations; banks; prohibition
Title
Certain affiliations; banks; prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (29-29-2-0) |
2022-02-24 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2022-02-24 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (28-31-1-0) |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-15 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-07 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |