AZ HB2650 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - sit Cow Action:
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - sit Cow Action:
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Divorce; waiting period; educational programs.
Title
Divorce; waiting period; educational programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | sit Cow Action: | |
2010-04-06 | House third reading , voting: (23-33-4-0) | |
2010-03-30 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-02-16 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-16 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-15 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-10 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2010-02-09 | House read second time | |
2010-02-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-08 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2010-02-08 | Introduced in House and read first time |