AZ HB2626 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - Chapter 207
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - Chapter 207
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Animal handling; microchip scan
Title
Animal handling; microchip scan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-29 | Senate | Chapter 207 |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-04-25 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (42-15-3-0) |
2022-04-25 | House | House concurs |
2022-04-25 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2022-04-25 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2022-04-19 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-1-3-0) |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (46-12-2-0) |
2022-02-15 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-14 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-14 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-02-09 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-01 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Animal Control
Animal Crematory Licensee (s)
Animal Handling
Cats And Dogs (s)
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Counties - Title 11
Deceased (s)
Duty (s)
Duty Of Veterinarian (s)
Exception (s)
Microchip (s)
Microchip Scan
Owner Notification (s)
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Trade And Commerce - Title 44
Animal Crematory Licensee (s)
Animal Handling
Cats And Dogs (s)
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Counties - Title 11
Deceased (s)
Duty (s)
Duty Of Veterinarian (s)
Exception (s)
Microchip (s)
Microchip Scan
Owner Notification (s)
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Trade And Commerce - Title 44
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 1013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 1014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 1021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 1029 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2232 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2294 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 500.48 | New Code | See Bill Text |